Limit your search

1-25 of 93
  1. S.Amdt.1843   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 08/01/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.1839   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.1838   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.1837   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.1836   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.1835   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.1834   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.1833   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.1832   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] (Submitted 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.1831   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 07/30/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  11. S.Amdt.1830   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 07/30/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.1825   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 07/30/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  13. S.Amdt.1824   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 07/30/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.1823   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] (Submitted 07/30/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  15. S.Amdt.1822   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  16. S.Amdt.1821   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.1820   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  18. S.Amdt.1818   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  19. S.Amdt.1817   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  20. S.Amdt.1816   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  21. S.Amdt.1815   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  22. S.Amdt.1814   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  23. S.Amdt.1813   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 07/29/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  24. S.Amdt.1812   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  25. S.Amdt.1811   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0