Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  • S.Amdt.1803   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the obligation or expenditure of funds made available to the Department of Transportation for cyber security until the Secretary of Transportation submits to Congress a detailed plan describing how the funding will be allocated and for what purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 07/25/2013) (Proposed 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/25/13 Amendment SA 1803 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.1789   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require the Federal Railroad Administration to evaluate regulations that govern the use of locomotive horns at highway-rail grade crossings.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 07/24/2013) (Proposed 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 07/25/13 Amendment SA 1789 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.1785   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To establish the Sense of the Congress that any vacancy in the position of Inspector General of the Federal Housing Finance Agency should be filled in compliance with the Federal Vacancies Reform Act of 1998.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] (Submitted 07/24/2013) (Proposed 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/25/13 Amendment SA 1785 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.1783   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require the Secretary of Transportation to assess the impact on domestic employment of a waiver of the Buy America requirement for Federal-aid highway projects prior to issuing the waiver.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] (Submitted 07/24/2013) (Proposed 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 07/31/13 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6085)
  • S.Amdt.1760   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require the Secretary of Transportation to submit to Congress a report relating to the condition of lane miles and highway bridge deck.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 07/24/2013) (Proposed 07/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 07/31/13 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6085)
  • S.Amdt.1756   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require public disclosure of certain reports.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/25/13 Amendment SA 1756 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.1754   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit Federal funds from being used to meet the matching requirements of other Federal Programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/31/13 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6085)
  • S.Amdt.1751   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit Federal funding of union activities by Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 07/31/13 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6085)
  • S.Amdt.1750   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit funds from being directed to federal employees with unpaid Federal tax liability.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/31/13 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6085)
  • S.Amdt.1749   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prioritize certain projects under the bridges in critical corridors program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 07/24/13 Amendment SA 1749 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S5857)
  • S.Amdt.1744   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit funds to be used to provide housing assistance benefits to individuals convicted of certain felonies.
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/23/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/23/13 Amendment SA 1744 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 1. Record Vote Number: 182.
  • S.Amdt.1739   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To redirect certain foreign assistance to the Government of Egypt as a result of the July 3, 2013, military coup d'etat.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 07/23/2013) (Proposed 07/31/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 07/31/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1739 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 86 - 13. Record Vote Number: 195.