Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/19/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/19/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/19/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/23/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/25/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/11/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/29/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/29/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/14/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/19/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/06/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 01/08/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/04/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/06/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 04/02/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/29/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/04/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/17/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/17/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/23/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/25/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/25/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/10/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/15/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/15/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/16/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/30/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/31/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/09/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/20/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/08/2014