Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/19/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/25/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/14/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/29/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/20/2014