Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/27/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/25/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/25/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/30/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 08/01/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/01/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/24/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/18/2013