Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/08/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/19/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/01/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/15/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/20/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/04/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/23/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 12/10/2014