Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/10/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/09/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/11/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/11/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/08/2014