Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 07/11/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/17/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/19/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/24/2014