Refine your search

Showing 26 of 26 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
09/18/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-32.
09/18/2013 Signed by President.
09/12/2013 Senate Presented to President.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2013-2:25pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 1 (Roll no. 452). (text: CR H5450-5451)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-2:18pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5456-5457)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:02pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:00pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 130.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:00pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5450-5451)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-1:00pm House Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 137.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-190.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/19/2013 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
06/21/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
06/20/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
06/20/2013-2:00pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4719)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
04/22/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
04/22/2013 Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-18.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources
03/14/2013 Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources
01/24/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
01/24/2013 Senate Introduced in Senate
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate