Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/18/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/09/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/19/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/24/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/07/2013