Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/16/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/19/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/12/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/24/2014