Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/19/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/17/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/17/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/17/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/18/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/19/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 06/19/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/13/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/03/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/07/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/15/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/15/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/15/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/12/2014