Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/29/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 08/01/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/09/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/30/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 11/12/2013