Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/23/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/11/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/28/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/07/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/14/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/18/2013