There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

SALTS Act
Synthetic Abuse and Labeling of Toxic Substances Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act relating to controlled substance analogues.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/18/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
05/14/2014Committee on United States Senate Caucus on International Narcotics Control. Hearings held.
09/25/2013Committee on United States Senate Caucus on International Narcotics Control. Hearings held.
07/18/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/19/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/27/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/18/2013 Referred to
Senate Narcotics Caucus05/14/2014 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1322. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/18/2013)

Synthetic Abuse and Labeling of Toxic Substances Act of 2013 or the SALTS Act - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to provide that, in determining whether a controlled substance analogue was intended for human consumption, the following factors may be considered: (1) the marketing, advertising, and labeling of the substance; (2) the known efficacy or usefulness of the substance for the marketed, advertised, or labeled purpose; (3) the difference between the price at which the substance is sold and the price at which the substance it is purported to be or advertised as is normally sold; (4) the diversion of the substance from legitimate channels and the clandestine importation, manufacture, or distribution of the substance; and (5) whether the defendant knew or should have known that the substance was intended to be consumed by injection, inhalation, ingestion, or any other immediate means.

Declares that evidence that a substance was not marketed, advertised, or labeled for human consumption shall not by itself be sufficient to establish that the substance was not intended for human consumption.