Text: S.1331 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/18/2013)

 
[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. 1331 Introduced in Senate (IS)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                S. 1331

    To extend the Generalized System of Preferences, and for other 
                               purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             July 18, 2013

 Mr. Baucus (for himself and Mr. Hatch) introduced the following bill; 
     which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
    To extend the Generalized System of Preferences, and for other 
                               purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF GENERALIZED SYSTEM OF PREFERENCES.

    Section 505 of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2465) is amended by 
striking ``July 31, 2013'' and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.

SEC. 2. CUSTOMS USER FEES.

    Section 13031(j)(3) of the Consolidated Omnibus Budget 
Reconciliation Act of 1985 (19 U.S.C. 58c(j)(3)) is amended--
            (1) in subparagraph (A), by striking ``October 22, 2021'' 
        and inserting ``January 21, 2022''; and
            (2) in subparagraph (B)(i), by striking ``October 29, 
        2021'' and inserting ``January 28, 2022''.

SEC. 3. TIME FOR PAYMENT OF CORPORATE ESTIMATED TAXES.

    Notwithstanding section 6655 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, 
in the case of a corporation with assets of not less than 
$1,000,000,000 (determined as of the end of the preceding taxable 
year)--
            (1) the amount of any required installment of corporate 
        estimated tax which is otherwise due in July, August, or 
        September of 2018 shall be increased by 1.25 percent of such 
        amount (determined without regard to any increase in such 
        amount not contained in such Code); and
            (2) the amount of the next required installment after an 
        installment referred to in paragraph (1) shall be appropriately 
        reduced to reflect the amount of the increase by reason of such 
        paragraph.
                                 <all>

Share This