Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/31/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/17/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/07/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/29/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/06/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/07/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 11/19/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/20/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/09/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/17/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/17/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/24/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/26/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/03/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/20/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/03/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/09/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/12/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/25/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/22/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/18/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew