There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Congressional Award Act.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/04/2013Became Public Law No: 113-43. (TXT | PDF)
10/04/2013Signed by President.
10/01/2013Presented to President.
09/30/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 35 (Roll no. 503).(text: CR H6020)
09/26/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6968)
09/23/2013Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 113-109.
07/23/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/04/2013Became Public Law No: 113-43. (TXT | PDF)
10/04/2013Signed by President.
10/01/2013SenatePresented to President.
09/30/2013-7:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 35 (Roll no. 503). (text: CR H6020)
09/30/2013-7:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6030-6031)
09/30/2013-10:57amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Foxx objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
09/30/2013-10:51amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1348.
09/30/2013-10:51amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6019-6020)
09/30/2013-10:51amHouseMs. Foxx moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/27/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
09/27/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2013-10:49amHouseReceived in the House.
09/26/2013SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6968)
09/26/2013SenateS.Amdt.1998 Amendment SA 1998 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2013SenateS.Amdt.1998 Amendment SA 1998 proposed by Senator Tester for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S6968; text: CR S6968) To change the enactment date.
09/26/2013SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6968)
09/23/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
09/23/2013SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 113-109.
07/31/2013SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/23/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 07/23/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/23/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
09/23/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-109
House Education and the Workforce09/27/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1348.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1348. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-43 (10/04/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 26, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Amends the Congressional Award Act to extend the date for termination of the Congressional Award Board from October 1, 2013, to October 1, 2018.