Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/24/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 07/24/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 08/01/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/19/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/25/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/26/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/26/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/30/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/07/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/08/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/15/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/30/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/05/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 11/19/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/19/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 11/19/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/19/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/19/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/21/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/07/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/24/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/24/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/04/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/25/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/25/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/01/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/29/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/29/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/01/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/21/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/18/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/18/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/07/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/21/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 07/22/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/11/2014