Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 07/24/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 07/24/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 07/24/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 10/29/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 11/18/2013