There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act of 1996, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/11/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-152.
03/24/2014Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged pursuant to the order of 1/13/2014.
01/13/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/24/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date
04/11/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 113-152.
Action By: Senate
03/24/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
Action By: Senate
03/24/2014Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged pursuant to the order of 1/13/2014.
Action By: Senate
01/13/2014Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs pursuant to the order of May 27, 1988.
Action By: Senate
01/13/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
12/18/2013Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
07/31/2013Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-126.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
07/24/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs07/24/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Hearings by
12/18/2013 Markup by
01/13/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-152
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/13/2014 Referred to
03/24/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1352. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (01/13/2014)

Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Title I: Block Grants and Grant Requirements - (Sec. 101) Amends the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act of 1996 (Act) to allow Indian housing block grant recipients to use income that is realized from program income without restriction.

Applies tribal prevailing wage laws to the administration of all federal funding for projects funded in part under that Act.

(Sec. 102) Deems compliance with the environmental review requirements of the Indian housing block grant projects to satisfy any other federal environmental review requirements imposed on agencies involved in the projects.

(Sec. 103) Reauthorizes appropriations for the block grants through FY2018.

Title II: Affordable Housing Activities - (Sec. 201) Makes an exception to the requirement that housing assisted under the Act remain affordable for the useful life of the property if: (1) a family or household member subsequently takes over ownership of a unit, or (2) an improvement is made to a privately owned unit and the aggregate value of that improvement for the five-year period following its completion is less than $10,000.

Allows rental housing made available to a current tenant for conversion to a homebuyer or lease-purchase unit to be purchased by the tenant if that tenant was a low-income family at the time of initial occupancy.

(Sec. 202) Applies lease termination notification requirements to any project or program funded in part under the Act.

(Sec. 203) Repeals a program allowing Indian tribes to use a portion of the block grants for housing activities wholly self-determined by the Indian tribe.

(Sec. 204) Prohibits affordable housing that is developed, acquired, or assisted under the block grant program from exceeding by more than 20% the total development cost maximum cost for all housing assisted under an affordable housing activity, without the approval of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD).

Title III: Compliance, Audits, and Reports - (Sec. 301) Requires the Secretary's annual report to Congress on the activities carried out under the Act to be submitted to the Senate Committee on Indian Affairs, Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs, and House Committee on Financial Services.

Requires that report to be made available to the public.

Title IV: Other Housing Assistance for Native Americans - (Sec. 401) Amends the United States Housing Act of 1937 to authorize the Secretary to implement a rental assistance and supportive housing demonstration program, in conjunction with the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA), for the benefit of Indian veterans who are homeless or at-risk of homelessness and who are residing on or near Indian areas. ("Indian areas" are defined as those areas within which an Indian tribe or a tribally designated housing entity provides affordable housing assistance under this Act.)

Authorizes the Secretary, in carrying out the demonstration program, to waive or establish alternative requirements regarding the use of rental assistance if doing so is necessary for the effective delivery and administration of rental assistance to Indian veterans.

(Sec. 402) Amends the Act to clarify that the 50-year limit on the lease of trust or Indian restricted lands for housing purposes does not affect any authority to lease those lands that is conferred pursuant to any other law in effect before, on, or after the enactment of that limit.

(Sec. 403) Reauthorizes appropriations, through FY2018, for the provision of training and technical assistance to Indian housing authorities and tribally designated housing entities.

Title V: Miscellaneous - (Sec. 501) Amends the Act to treat a tribally designated housing entity as a community-based development organization for purposes of the Indian Community Development Block Grant program.

(Sec. 502) Repeals the provision of the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2008 that prohibits the use of funds under that Act for the benefit of the Cherokee Nation unless the Temporary Order and Temporary Injunction issued on May 14, 2007, by the District Court of the Cherokee Nation remains in effect or there is a settlement agreement which ends litigation among the adverse parties.

(Sec. 503) Reauthorizes the Native Hawaiian Homeownership Act through FY2018.

(Sec. 504) Allows all funds provided under a grant made pursuant to this Act to be used to meet matching or cost participation requirements under any other federal or nonfederal program.