There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the trade adjustment assistance program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/24/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/24/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/24/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/29/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/16/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 12/19/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance07/24/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1357. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/24/2013)

Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2013 - Amends the Trade Act of 1974 to extend through December 31, 2020: (1) the trade adjustment assistance (TAA) program, and (2) the reemployment trade adjustment assistance (RTAA) program.

Makes funds available through FY2020, and for the period beginning October 1-December 31, 2020 (first quarter of FY2021) for training of adversely affected workers, employment and case management services, and job search expenses and relocation expenses.

Reauthorizes appropriations: (1) through December 31, 2020, for the TAA program for workers; and (2) through FY2020, and for the first quarter of FY2021, for the TAA program for firms and farmers.

Amends the Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2011 to declare that TAA program requirements in effect as of February 13, 2011, under the Trade Act of 1974 shall apply to petitions for certification to apply for TAA for workers, firms, and farmers that are filed before January 1, 2021.