Text: S.1357 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/24/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1357


To extend the trade adjustment assistance program.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 24, 2013

Mr. Baucus (for himself and Ms. Collins) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


A BILL

To extend the trade adjustment assistance program.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Extension of trade adjustment assistance program.

(a) Extension of termination provisions.—Section 285 of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2271 note) is amended by striking “2013” each place it appears and inserting “2020”.

(b) Training funds.—Section 236(a)(2)(A) of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2296(a)(2)(A)) is amended—

(1) in clause (i), by striking “and 2013” and inserting “through 2020”; and

(2) in clause (ii), by striking “2013” each place it appears and inserting “2020”.

(c) Reemployment trade adjustment assistance.—Section 246(b)(1) of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2318(b)(1)) is amended by striking “2013” and inserting “2020”.

(d) Authorizations of appropriations.—

(1) TRADE ADJUSTMENT ASSISTANCE FOR WORKERS.—Section 245(a) of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2317(a)) is amended by striking “2013” and inserting “2020”.

(2) TRADE ADJUSTMENT ASSISTANCE FOR FIRMS.—Section 255(a) of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2345(a)) is amended—

(A) by striking “and 2013” and inserting “through 2020”; and

(B) by striking “October 1, 2013, and ending on December 31, 2013” and inserting “October 1, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020”.

(3) TRADE ADJUSTMENT ASSISTANCE FOR FARMERS.—Section 298(a) of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2401g(a)) is amended—

(A) by striking “and 2013” and inserting “through 2020”; and

(B) by striking “October 1, 2013, and ending on December 31, 2013” and inserting “October 1, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020”.

(e) Amendments to Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2011.—

(1) APPLICATION OF PRIOR LAW.—Section 233(a) of the Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2011 (title II of Public Law 112–40; 125 Stat. 416; 19 U.S.C. 2271 note prec.) is amended—

(A) in the matter preceding paragraph (1), by striking “2014” and inserting “2021”; and

(B) by striking paragraphs (3) through (7) and inserting the following:

“(3) section 245(a) of that Act shall be applied and administered by substituting ‘2021’ for ‘2007’;

“(4) section 246(b)(1) of that Act shall be applied and administered by substituting ‘December 31, 2021’ for ‘the date that is 5 years’ and all that follows through ‘State’;

“(5) section 256(b) of that Act shall be applied and administered by substituting ‘the 1-year period beginning on January 1, 2021’ for ‘each of fiscal years 2003 through 2007, and $4,000,000 for the 3-month period beginning on October 1, 2007’;

“(6) section 298(a) of that Act shall be applied and administered by substituting ‘the 1-year period beginning on January 1, 2021’ for ‘each of the fiscal years’ and all that follows through ‘October 1, 2007’; and

“(7) section 285 of that Act shall be applied and administered—

“(A) in subsection (a), by substituting ‘2021’ for ‘2007’ each place it appears; and

“(B) by applying and administering subsection (b) as if it read as follows:

“‘(b) Other assistance.—

“‘(1) ASSISTANCE FOR FIRMS.—

“‘(A) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in subparagraph (B), assistance may not be provided under chapter 3 after December 31, 2021.

“‘(B) EXCEPTION.—Notwithstanding subparagraph (A), any assistance approved under chapter 3 on or before December 31, 2021, may be provided—

“‘(i) to the extent funds are available pursuant to such chapter for such purpose; and

“‘(ii) to the extent the recipient of the assistance is otherwise eligible to receive such assistance.

“‘(2) FARMERS.—

“‘(A) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in subparagraph (B), assistance may not be provided under chapter 6 after December 31, 2021.

“‘(B) EXCEPTION.—Notwithstanding subparagraph (A), any assistance approved under chapter 6 on or before December 31, 2021, may be provided—

“‘(i) to the extent funds are available pursuant to such chapter for such purpose; and

“‘(ii) to the extent the recipient of the assistance is otherwise eligible to receive such assistance.’.”.

(2) CONTINUATION OF BENEFITS.—Section 233(b) of the Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2011 is amended by striking “2014” each place it appears and inserting “2021”.


Share This Section