Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/25/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 07/25/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/25/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 07/25/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/10/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/18/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/18/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/23/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/25/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/27/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/11/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/11/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/28/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/30/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/30/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/05/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/06/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/06/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 02/06/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/03/2014