Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 07/29/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/29/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/23/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/26/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/30/2014