Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/18/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/18/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/20/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/06/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/10/2014