Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/25/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/12/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/12/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/12/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/29/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 07/30/2014