Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/03/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/18/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/13/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 12/02/2014