There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to make supplemental agricultural disaster assistance available for fiscal years 2012 and 2013, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
01/24/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Action By: Senate
01/24/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S288)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/24/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 01/28/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/30/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/11/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/08/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/17/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/09/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry01/24/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)

  • Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
  • Aquaculture
  • Disaster relief and insurance
  • Fires
  • Forests, forestry, trees
  • Insects
  • Livestock

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.141. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/24/2013)

Makes livestock indemnity payments (at 65% of an animal's market value) through FY2013 to eligible producers on farms that have incurred excess livestock death losses due to: (1) attacks by animals reintroduced into the wild by the federal government or protected by federal law, including wolves; or (2) adverse weather, including hurricanes, floods, blizzards, disease, wildfires, extreme heat, and extreme cold.

Establishes a livestock forage disaster program to provide one source for livestock forage disaster assistance for weather-related forage losses by combining: (1) the livestock forage assistance functions of the non insured crop disaster assistance program and the emergency assistance for livestock, honey bees, and farm-raised fish program; and (2) the livestock forage disaster program.

Provides assistance through FY2013 for forage losses: (1) due to drought on land that is native or improved pasture land with permanent vegetative cover or is planted to a crop planted specifically for the purpose of providing grazing for covered livestock; (2) on federally-managed rangeland due to a fire; and (3) due to weather-related conditions other than drought or fire on land that is native or improved pasture land with permanent vegetative cover, or is planted to a crop planted specifically for the purpose of providing grazing for covered livestock.

Provides funds through FY2013 for: (1) emergency assistance to eligible producers of livestock, honey bees, and farm-raised fish to aid in the reduction of losses due to disease, adverse weather, or other conditions, such as blizzards and wildfires; and (2) assistance to eligible orchardists and nursery tree growers that planted trees for commercial purposes but lost the trees as a result of a natural disaster, and to eligible orchardists and nursery tree growers that have a production history for commercial purposes on planted or existing trees but lost the trees as a result of a natural disaster (requires tree mortality to exceed 15%).

Amends the Federal Agriculture Improvement and Reform Act of 1996 to provide coverages based on individual yields (other than for value-loss crops) under the non insured crop disaster assistance program equivalent to: (1) catastrophic risk protection, or (2) specified additional coverage.

Makes additional program coverage available at 50% to 65% of established yield and 100% of average market price. Reduces the premium for additional coverage by 50% for limited resource, beginning, and socially disadvantaged farmers.

Makes assistance available as soon as practicable to producers with 2012 losses of certain fruit crops in counties declared a disaster due to freeze or frost.