Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/24/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/24/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 01/28/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/30/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/11/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/08/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/17/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/09/2013