Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 07/31/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 12/18/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 01/27/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/30/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/03/2014