Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/26/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/26/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/30/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 10/28/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/11/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/18/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/19/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/16/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/16/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/11/2014