There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Marine and Hydrokinetic Renewable Energy Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Marine and Hydrokinetic Renewable Energy Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to promote research, development, and demonstration of marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy technologies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/10/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-294.
08/01/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
12/10/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 634.
Action By: Senate
12/10/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-294.
11/13/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/27/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-284.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
08/01/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6213-6214)
Action By: Senate
08/01/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6211-6213)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 08/01/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/30/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/13/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/11/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources08/01/2013 Referred to
11/13/2014 Markup by
12/10/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-294
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/27/2014 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.1419.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1419. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/10/2014)

Marine and Hydrokinetic Renewable Energy Act of 2014 - Title I: Marine and Hydrokinetic Renewable Energy Technologies - (Sec. 101) Amends the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 to redefine "marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy" to include all forms of energy (currently just electrical energy) from: (1) waves, tides, and currents in oceans, estuaries, and tidal areas; (2) free flowing water in rivers, lakes, and streams; (3) free flowing water in man-made channels; and (4) differentials in ocean temperature (ocean thermal energy conversion).

(Sec. 102) Requires Department of Energy (DOE) to consult with the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) in carrying out the program of research, development, demonstration, and commercial application to accelerate the introduction of marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy production. Requires DOE to prioritize fostering accelerated research, development, and commercialization of technology.

Expands such program, including by: (1) incorporating technology development assistance to improve the components, processes, and systems used for power generation from marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy resources; (2) establishing critical testing infrastructure; (3) increasing the reliability and survivability of such technologies; and (4) supporting in-water technology development with international partners.

(Sec. 103) Declares that the purposes of a National Marine Renewable Energy Research, Development, and Demonstration Center include:

  • advance research, development, demonstration, and commercial application of marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy technologies;
  • support of in-water testing and demonstration of such technologies; and
  • service as an information clearinghouse on best practices for the marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy industry.

(Sec. 104) Extends the authorization of funding for the program through FY2018.

Title II: National Marine Renewable Energy Research, Development, and Demonstration Centers - (Sec. 201) Amends the Federal Power Act to authorize FERC to issue a pilot license to construct, operate, and maintain a hydrokinetic pilot project that meets specified criteria.