There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the Junction City Community-Based Outpatient Clinic located at 715 Southwind Drive, Junction City, Kansas, as the Lieutenant General Richard J. Seitz Community-Based Outpatient Clinic.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-231. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014Presented to President.
12/08/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8856)
01/14/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S333-334)
01/14/2014Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S333-334)
08/01/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-231. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2014-4:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2014-4:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8856)
12/08/2014-4:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1434.
12/08/2014-4:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8856-8857)
12/08/2014-4:26pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/28/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/15/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/15/2014-11:26amHouseReceived in the House.
01/15/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/14/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S333-334)
01/14/2014SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S333-334)
10/30/2013SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-280.
08/01/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 08/01/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/01/2013 Referred to
10/30/2013 Hearings by
01/14/2014 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs01/15/2014 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health01/28/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1434. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-231 (12/16/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the Junction City Community-Based Outpatient Clinic located at 715 Southwind Drive, Junction City, Kansas, as the "Lieutenant General Richard J. Seitz Community-Based Outpatient Clinic."