Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/11/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/23/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/25/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/03/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/05/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/14/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/21/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/04/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/23/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/26/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/11/2014