Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/09/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/11/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/17/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/16/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/07/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/07/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/30/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/30/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/30/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/30/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/30/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/30/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/30/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/30/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/30/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 01/30/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/30/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/30/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/25/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/27/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/04/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/13/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/13/2014