Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/18/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/02/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/17/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/17/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/25/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/16/2014