Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 08/01/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/17/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/17/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/18/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/13/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/18/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/20/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/09/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/13/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/01/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/20/2014