Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 01/07/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/07/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/07/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/12/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/25/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/24/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/24/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/26/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/26/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/26/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/31/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/09/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/09/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/10/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/12/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 11/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/12/2014