Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/20/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-65.
12/20/2013 Signed by President.
12/13/2013 Presented to President.
12/11/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 1 (Roll no. 634).(text: CR H7640-7641)
11/18/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8136)
11/18/2013 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2013 Introduced in Senate