There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Alicia Dawn Koehl Respect for National Cemeteries Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Alicia Dawn Koehl Respect for National Cemeteries Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Alicia Dawn Koehl Respect for National Cemeteries Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Alicia Dawn Koehl Respect for National Cemeteries Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs and the Secretary of the Army to reconsider decisions to inter or honor the memory of a person in a national cemetery, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2013Became Public Law No: 113-65. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2013Signed by President.
12/13/2013Presented to President.
12/11/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 1 (Roll no. 634).(text: CR H7640-7641)
11/18/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8136)
11/18/2013Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2013Became Public Law No: 113-65. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2013Signed by President.
12/13/2013SenatePresented to President.
12/11/2013-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 1 (Roll no. 634). (text: CR H7640-7641)
12/11/2013-4:10pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7667-7668)
12/11/2013-12:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/11/2013-12:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1471.
12/11/2013-12:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7640-7642)
12/11/2013-12:43pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/25/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/18/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/18/2013-8:43pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/18/2013SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8136)
11/18/2013SenateS.Amdt.2146 Amendment SA 2146 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/2013SenateS.Amdt.2146 Amendment SA 2146 proposed by Senator Boxer for Senator Sanders. (consideration: CR S8135-8136; text: CR S8135-8136) Relative to authority to reconsider decisions of Secretary of Veterans Affairs or Secretary of the Army to inter the remains or honor the memory of a person in a national cemetery.
11/18/2013SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8135-8136)
11/18/2013SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/30/2013SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-280.
08/01/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 08/01/2013

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/01/2013 Referred to
10/30/2013 Hearings by
11/18/2013 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs11/18/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs11/25/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services11/18/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1471. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-65 (12/20/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on November 18, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Alicia Dawn Koehl Respect for National Cemeteries Act - Authorizes the appropriate federal official (either the Secretary of Veterans Affairs [VA] or the Secretary of the Army) to reconsider a decision to inter or honor the memory of a person in the National Cemetery Administration or in Arlington National Cemetery upon receiving information that such person may have committed a federal or state capital crime but was not convicted by reason of unavailability for trial due to death or flight to avoid prosecution.

Requires such official, upon finding, after an opportunity for a hearing, that the person committed but was not convicted of such crime, to provide notice to the individual's next of kin or other person authorized to arrange burial or memorialization of the deceased person of the decision to disinter such person's remains or remove a memorial headstone or marker. Allows such next of kin or other person 60 days to file a notice of disagreement, which shall initiate appellate review. Authorizes the appropriate federal official, when a decision becomes final, to disinter the remains or remove the memorial headstone or marker.

Modifies the exception to the prohibition against interment or memorialization in the National Cemetery System or Arlington National Cemetery of a person convicted of a federal or state capital crime to require receipt of written notice of a conviction before interment or memorialization takes place (currently, receipt of such notice is required before the appropriate federal official approves an application for interment or memorialization).

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs: (1) to disinter the remains of Michael LaShawn Anderson from Fort Custer National Cemetery (Michigan); (2) to notify his next of kin of the impending disinterment; and (3) upon disinterment, to relinquish the remains to the next of kin or, if the next of kin of record is unavailable, arrange for the appropriate disposition of the remains.