Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 08/01/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/11/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/19/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/14/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/27/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/26/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/19/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/08/2014