Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 09/09/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/10/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/17/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/10/2013