There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Authority for Mandate Delay Act
  • Fairness for American Families Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to delay the application of the individual health insurance mandate, to delay the application of the employer health insurance mandate, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/09/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
09/09/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 09/09/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/10/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/10/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/12/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/12/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/12/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/12/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/12/2013
Sen. Chiesa, Jeff [R-NJ] 09/12/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/12/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/12/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/12/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/12/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/12/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/12/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/17/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/17/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/17/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/17/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/17/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/24/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/26/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance09/09/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1488. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/09/2013)

Fairness for American Families Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, as amended by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), to delay until 2015 the requirement that individuals maintain minimal essential health care coverage.

Authority for Mandate Delay Act - Amends PPACA to delay until 2015 enforcement of requirements that large employers offer their full-time employees the opportunity to enroll in minimum essential coverage. Delays the effective date of related reporting requirements for such employers and for providers of minimum essential coverage.