Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 09/10/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 09/10/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/10/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/10/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 09/10/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 09/10/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/12/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/18/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/18/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/23/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/23/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/25/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/30/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/29/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/29/2013