Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/18/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/07/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/26/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/26/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/27/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/05/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/09/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/09/2014