Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
11/26/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-192.
11/26/2014 Signed by President.
11/19/2014 Presented to President.
11/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8007)
11/12/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7964; text as passed Senate: CR S7964)
11/06/2013 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
09/12/2013 Introduced in Senate