Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 02/27/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 08/01/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/11/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/28/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/24/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/25/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/27/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/22/2014