Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 09/17/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/04/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 11/04/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/06/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/12/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/07/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/15/2014