Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/28/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/29/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/29/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/14/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/21/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/29/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/24/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/12/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/10/2014